WA SB5748 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating an account to support necessary infrastructure nearby military installations.
Title
Creating an account to support necessary infrastructure nearby military installations.
Sponsors
Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Steve O'Ban [R] | Sen. David Frockt [D] | Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] |
Sen. Emily Randall [D] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Chapter 404, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-27 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 45; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2019-04-15 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-04-15 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-15 | House | Committee recommendations adopted and the bill amended. |
2019-04-12 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-04-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-04-05 | House | CB - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 9:00 AM. |
2019-04-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 9:00 AM. |
2019-03-12 | House | First reading, referred to Capital Budget. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |