WA SB5742 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-19 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-19 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning local government crime-free rental housing programs.
Title
Concerning local government crime-free rental housing programs.
Sponsors
Sen. James Hargrove [D] | Sen. Brian Hatfield [D] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Rep. Bob McCaslin [R] |
Sen. Mark Schoesler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-19 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-19 | Chapter 132, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-19 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-10 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-10 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-09 | President signed. | |
2010-03-08 | Passed final passage; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2010-03-08 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2010-02-28 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-02-28 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-28 | Committee recommendations adopted and the bill amended. | |
2010-02-26 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-24 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-22 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-22 | JUDI - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-02-22 | JUDI - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-22 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-17 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-02-10 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. | |
2010-02-08 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 3. | |
2010-02-08 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-08 | Floor amendment | |
2010-02-08 | Returned to second reading for amendment. | |
2010-02-08 | Rules suspended. | |
2010-02-05 | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-01-11 | Made eligible to be placed on third reading. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-04-26 | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2009-03-13 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. | |
2009-03-11 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2009-03-11 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-11 | Floor amendment | |
2009-03-11 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-03-06 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-25 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2009-02-25 | HSC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-23 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 6:00 PM. | |
2009-02-12 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-01-30 | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |