WA SB5734 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Encouraging achieving a better life experience accounts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Encouraging achieving a better life experience accounts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-08SenateBy resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
2023-02-24SenateExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2023-02-20SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM.
2023-02-09SenateFirst reading, referred to Ways & Means.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
43330New CodeSee Bill Text
43330464Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback