WA SB5703 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning consumer reports of employees or volunteers who will or may have unsupervised access to children, individuals with developmental disabilities, or vulnerable adults.
Title
Concerning consumer reports of employees or volunteers who will or may have unsupervised access to children, individuals with developmental disabilities, or vulnerable adults.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2011-02-21 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-18 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2011-02-18 | HSC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-02-17 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 6:00 PM. | |
2011-02-17 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-02-08 | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |