WA SB5700 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the release of juveniles in the custody of juvenile rehabilitation.
Title
Concerning the release of juveniles in the custody of juvenile rehabilitation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |