WA SB5684 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding water well construction requirements.
Title
Regarding water well construction requirements.
Sponsors
Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] | Sen. Joe Fain [R] | Sen. Karen Fraser [D] | Sen. Phillips Rockefeller [D] |
Sen. Paull Shin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-02-22 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2012-02-03 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2012-02-03 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2012-02-03 | ENV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2012-02-03 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment at 8:00 AM. | |
2012-01-24 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment at 10:00 AM. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-12-07 | Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to Environment. | |
2011-12-07 | Committee relieved of further consideration. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-02-07 | First reading, referred to Environment, Water & Energy. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1685 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.