WA SB5682 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the secretary of transportation to realign the transportation regions.
Title
Requiring the secretary of transportation to realign the transportation regions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-26 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2010-01-11 | Made eligible to be placed on third reading. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-04-26 | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2009-03-25 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-03-13 | First reading, referred to Transportation. | |
2009-03-11 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 42; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-03-11 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-11 | Floor amendment | |
2009-03-11 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-02 | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-25 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-16 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-01-28 | First reading, referred to Transportation. |