WA SB5674 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing the final approval of subdivisions of land.
Title
Addressing the final approval of subdivisions of land.
Sponsors
Sen. Guy Palumbo [D] | Sen. Joe Fain [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | Senate | Effective date 7/23/2017. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Chapter 161, 2017 Laws. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-04-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-04-14 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-04-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 55; nays, 43; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-04-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-04-07 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-03-28 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-03-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-03-28 | House | LG - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2017-03-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-07 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1862 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - Referred to Local Government.