WA SB5670 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on March 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-31 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying expenditures under the state universal communications services program.
Title
Clarifying expenditures under the state universal communications services program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-04 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | Senate | Effective date 6/9/2016. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Chapter 145, 2016 Laws. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-03 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-29 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-29 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2016-02-29 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2016-02-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-27 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2016-02-18 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 37; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-03-09 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 39; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass EET 15 bill proposed by Energy, Environment & Telecommunications. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | EET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy and Environment & Telecommunications at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Energy and Environment & Telecommunications at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | First reading, referred to Energy, Environment & Telecommunications. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1782 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.