WA SB5668 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning moneys received at auctions conducted by registered tow truck operators.
Title
Concerning moneys received at auctions conducted by registered tow truck operators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-27 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Chapter 357, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-27 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-27 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-26 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-22 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-04-19 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2019-04-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2019-04-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 9:00 AM. |
2019-03-15 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2019-03-15 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2019-03-14 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1684 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.