WA SB5667 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the off-duty conduct of an employee or a prospective employee.
Title
Concerning the off-duty conduct of an employee or a prospective employee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 12:00 PM. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce, Labor & Sports. |