WA SB5665 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizing counties with community empowerment zones to qualify as an eligible area for investment projects in rural counties.
Title
Reauthorizing counties with community empowerment zones to qualify as an eligible area for investment projects in rural counties.
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Brown [D] | Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] | Sen. James Kastama [D] | Sen. Derek Kilmer [D] |
Sen. Scott White [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-02-07 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Economic Development and Trade & Innovation at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-03 | First reading, referred to Economic Development, Trade & Innovation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1870 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5665&year=2011 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2011-12/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5665.pdf |