WA SB5656 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revising business licensing systems.
Title
Revising business licensing systems.
Sponsors
Sen. John Braun [R] | Sen. Michael Carrell [R] | Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] |
Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. Joe Fain [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-04-02 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2013-04-01 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2013-03-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-03-28 | House | LG - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2013-03-28 | House | LG - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-03-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:30 AM. |
2013-03-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2013-03-13 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 33; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2013-03-11 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass TRED 13 bill proposed by Trade & Economic Development. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | TRED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Trade & Economic Development at 5:30 PM. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Trade & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | First reading, referred to Trade & Economic Development. |