WA SB5648 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Health & Long Term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Health & Long Term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning hospital privileges for advanced registered nurse practitioners and physician assistants.
Title
Concerning hospital privileges for advanced registered nurse practitioners and physician assistants.
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Dean Takko [D] |
Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Annette Cleveland [D] | Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1432 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-23 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5648&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5648.pdf |