WA SB5642 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting a sale or transfer of real property for affordable housing to a nonprofit entity, housing authority, public corporation, county, or municipal corporation from the real estate excise tax.
Title
Exempting a sale or transfer of real property for affordable housing to a nonprofit entity, housing authority, public corporation, county, or municipal corporation from the real estate excise tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | HLG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing & Local Government. |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1643 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-30 - Effective date 6/9/2022*.