WA SB5642 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the student achievement council to develop a grant program to encourage training for students studying in the medical field to work with individuals with disabilities.
Title
Requiring the student achievement council to develop a grant program to encourage training for students studying in the medical field to work with individuals with disabilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-27 | Senate | First reading, referred to Higher Education. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1367 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5642&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5642.pdf |