WA SB5629 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning control of the disposition of remains.
Title
Concerning control of the disposition of remains.
Sponsors
Sen. John Lovick [D] | Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] |
Sen. Jamie Pedersen [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-23 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass. |
2022-02-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-22 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-18 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-11 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2022-01-03 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |