WA SB5626 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-15 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-15 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding and enhancing media literacy and digital citizenship in K-12 education.
Title
Expanding and enhancing media literacy and digital citizenship in K-12 education.
Sponsors
Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. Judith Warnick [R] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. T'wina Nobles [D] |
Sen. Jamie Pedersen [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-27 - House - House Committee on Education: do pass with amendment(s) by Education (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Early Learning & K-12 Education (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Early Learning & K-12 Education (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2023-03-29 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2023-03-27 | House | ED - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2023-03-27 | House | ED - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2023-03-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2023-03-13 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2023-03-06 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2023-02-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |