WA SB5619 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Health & Long-term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Health & Long-term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying which surgical facilities the Washington state department of health is mandated to license pursuant to chapter 70.230 RCW.
Title
Clarifying which surgical facilities the Washington state department of health is mandated to license pursuant to chapter 70.230 RCW.
Sponsors
Sen. Randi Becker [R] | Sen. Michael Carrell [R] | Sen. Linda Evans-Parlette [R] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] |
Sen. Paull Shin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-02-01 | First reading, referred to Health & Long-Term Care. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1575 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-14 - Effective Date is January 1, 2012
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5619&year=2011 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2011-12/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5619.pdf |