WA SB5618 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning arrest of sixteen and seventeen year olds for domestic violence assault.
Title
Concerning arrest of sixteen and seventeen year olds for domestic violence assault.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Effective date 7/23/2017. |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Chapter 223, 2017 Laws. |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-04-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2017-04-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 91; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2017-04-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-04-06 | House | Committee amendment |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-03-29 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-03-29 | House | ELHS - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2017-03-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-28 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2017-03-22 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-15 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2017-03-07 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | HSMH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Mental Health & Housing at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Mental Health & Housing at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing. |