WA SB5618 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - Third reading, failed; yeas, 21; nays, 28; absent, 0; excused, 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - Third reading, failed; yeas, 21; nays, 28; absent, 0; excused, 0.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Limiting private activity bond issues by out-of-state issuers.
Title
Limiting private activity bond issues by out-of-state issuers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-05 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-05 | Third reading, failed; yeas, 21; nays, 28; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2011-03-05 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-05 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2011-03-02 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-02-18 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-17 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-02-17 | FIHI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-02-16 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-15 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions and Housing & Insurance at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-02-01 | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Housing & Insurance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1761 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-29 - Effective date 7/22/2011.