WA SB5617 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Changing early learning advisory council provisions.
Title
Changing early learning advisory council provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-10 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-10 | Chapter 12, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-10 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-05 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-04 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-02 | President signed. | |
2010-02-28 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-02-28 | Placed on third reading. | |
2010-02-28 | Committee recommendations adopted. | |
2010-02-26 | Placed on second reading suspension calendar by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-24 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-23 | ELCS - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-23 | ELCS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-23 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Children's Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-19 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Children's Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-09 | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Children's Services. | |
2010-02-08 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2010-02-08 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-08 | Floor amendment | |
2010-01-28 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-01-11 | On motion, referred to Rules Green Sheet for second reading. | |
2009-04-26 | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2009-04-23 | Senate adheres to its position. | |
2009-04-22 | House insists on its position and asks Senate to concur. | |
2009-04-20 | Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments. | |
2009-04-08 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-04-08 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-08 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2009-04-06 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-30 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-27 | ELCS - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2009-03-27 | ELCS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-27 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Children's Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-26 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Children's Services at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-03-11 | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Children's Services. | |
2009-03-09 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2009-03-09 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-09 | Floor amendment | |
2009-03-09 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-05 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-02-17 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-17 | EDU - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-16 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-11 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-01-27 | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |