WA SB5615 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting certain firearms transfers involving military members, law enforcement officers, and corrections officers from background check requirements.
Title
Exempting certain firearms transfers involving military members, law enforcement officers, and corrections officers from background check requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2016-01-19 | Senate | On motion, referred to Rules Green Sheet for second reading. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-13 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5615&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5615.pdf |