WA SB5580 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning broadband infrastructure loans and grants made by the public works board.
Title
Concerning broadband infrastructure loans and grants made by the public works board.
Sponsors
Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] | Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. David Frockt [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] |
Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Judith Warnick [R] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | ENET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:30 AM. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2021-12-22 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1673 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-30 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
42 | 56 | 270 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 155 | 160 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |