WA HB1673 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning broadband infrastructure loans and grants made by the public works board.
Title
Concerning broadband infrastructure loans and grants made by the public works board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House Committee on Capital Budget: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Community & Economic Development (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-14 - House - House Committee on Community & Economic Development: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House Committee on Capital Budget: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Community & Economic Development (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-14 - House - House Committee on Community & Economic Development: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | Effective date 6/9/2022. |
2022-03-30 | House | Chapter 201, 2022 Laws. |
2022-03-30 | House | Governor signed. |
2022-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2022-03-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 96; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2022-03-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-22 | Senate | ENET - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:30 AM. |
2022-02-12 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2022-02-10 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2022-02-10 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2022-02-10 | House | Floor amendment |
2022-02-10 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2022-02-09 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-04 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-04 | House | CB - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Community & Economic Development. |
2022-02-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. |
2022-02-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 1:30 PM. |
2022-01-18 | House | Referred to Capital Budget. |
2022-01-14 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-01-14 | House | CED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-01-14 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-11 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Community & Economic Development. |
2021-12-20 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5580 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-17 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
42 | 56 | 270 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 155 | 160 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |