WA SB5565 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-16 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-16 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning direct contractor liability for payment of wages and benefits.
Title
Concerning direct contractor liability for payment of wages and benefits.
Sponsors
Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] |
Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Emily Randall [D] | Sen. Dean Takko [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:05 PM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1395 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=5565&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5565.pdf |