WA SB5558 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Issuing a two-year identicard for offenders released from prison facilities.
Title
Issuing a two-year identicard for offenders released from prison facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-07-20 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2017-06-27 | House | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2017-06-13 | House | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-05-05 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Rules White Sheet. |
2017-04-23 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-04-04 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-04-04 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-04-04 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2017-04-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 11:00 AM. |
2017-04-03 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2017-04-01 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2017-03-27 | House | PS - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-21 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-09 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | 3rd substitute bill substituted |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Returned to second reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | WM - Majority; 3rd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 11:00 AM. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Transportation. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | And refer to Transportation. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1679 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-19 - Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.