WA SB5548 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring project improvements, including public transportation infrastructure improvements, to be credited against the imposition of impact fees.
Title
Requiring project improvements, including public transportation infrastructure improvements, to be credited against the imposition of impact fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-03-11 | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2010-02-24 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-22 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-22 | LGH - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-22 | LGH - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-22 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government & Housing at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-13 | First reading, referred to Local Government & Housing. | |
2010-02-12 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 42; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 6. | |
2010-02-12 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-12 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-10 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-03 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-03 | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-01 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-20 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-11 | Senate refers bill from Rules to Transportation. | |
2009-04-26 | Returned to Senate Rules 3. | |
2009-04-23 | House insists on its position and asks Senate to recede. | |
2009-04-19 | Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments. | |
2009-04-08 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-04-08 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-08 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2009-04-06 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-30 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-26 | LGH - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2009-03-26 | LGH - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-26 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government & Housing at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-03-25 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government & Housing at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-03-06 | First reading, referred to Local Government & Housing. | |
2009-03-04 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-03-04 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-03 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-26 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-26 | TRAN - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-24 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-02-19 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-26 | First reading, referred to Transportation. |