WA SB5542 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the practice of optometry.
Title
Concerning the practice of optometry.
Sponsors
Sen. Annette Cleveland [D] | Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. John Lovick [D] |
Sen. June Robinson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 53 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 54 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 54 | 050 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 54 | 060 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 54 | 070 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |