WA SB5536 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the recoupment of certain costs by collection agencies.
Title
Concerning the recoupment of certain costs by collection agencies.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] | Sen. Jan Angel [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2016-01-19 | Senate | On motion, referred to Rules Green Sheet for second reading. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:45 PM. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | FI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 1:30 PM. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions & Insurance. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1649 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.