WA SB5533 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting contributions to gubernatorial candidates by entities that collectively bargain with the state.
Title
Prohibiting contributions to gubernatorial candidates by entities that collectively bargain with the state.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Baumgartner [R] | Sen. Phil Fortunato [R] | Sen. John Braun [R] | Sen. Sharon Brown [R] |
Sen. Lynda Wilson [R] | Sen. Randi Becker [R] | Sen. Mike Padden [R] | Sen. Jan Angel [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Rules White Sheet. |
2017-04-23 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-09 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 25; nays, 24; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Commerce, Labor & Sports. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | CLS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 5:45 PM. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce, Labor & Sports. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1891 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.