WA HB1891 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House State Government, Elections & Information Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House State Government, Elections & Information Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting contributions to gubernatorial candidates by entities that collectively bargain with the state.
Title
Prohibiting contributions to gubernatorial candidates by entities that collectively bargain with the state.
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Manweller [R] | Rep. David Taylor [R] | Rep. Vincent Buys [R] | Rep. Luanne Van Werven [R] |
Rep. Joe Schmick [R] | Rep. Cary Condotta [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-02 | House | First reading, referred to State Government, Elections & Information Technology |
Same As/Similar To
SB5533 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1891&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1891.pdf |