WA SB5527 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM.
Pending: Senate Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM.
Pending: Senate Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Simplifying and enforcing employee status under employment laws to ensure fairness to employers and employees and address the underground economy.
Title
Simplifying and enforcing employee status under employment laws to ensure fairness to employers and employees and address the underground economy.
Sponsors
Sen. David Frockt [D] | Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] |
Sen. Steven Conway [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 12:00 PM. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce, Labor & Sports. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1300 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-18 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5527&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5527.pdf |