WA HB1300 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-18 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-18 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Simplifying and enforcing employee status under employment laws to ensure fairness to employers and employees and address the underground economy.
Title
Simplifying and enforcing employee status under employment laws to ensure fairness to employers and employees and address the underground economy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-18 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-17 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-02-24 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2017-02-23 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-22 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-21 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2017-02-02 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-02 | House | LAWS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-31 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards |
Same As/Similar To
SB5527 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-17 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM.