WA SB5523 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Improving managed care organization performance in caring for medicaid clients.
Title
Improving managed care organization performance in caring for medicaid clients.
Sponsors
Sen. John Braun [R] | Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. David Frockt [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2019-04-06 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2019-04-05 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2019-04-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-15 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2019-03-13 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; without recommendation. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |