WA SB5519 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Reforming competency evaluation and restoration procedures.
Title
Reforming competency evaluation and restoration procedures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-02-26 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2010-01-11 | Made eligible to be placed on third reading. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-04-26 | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2009-04-17 | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-04-10 | Placed on second reading. | |
2009-03-30 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-26 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-03-26 | HS - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2009-03-26 | HS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-26 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-03-23 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-16 | Referred to Human Services. | |
2009-03-16 | Committee relieved of further consideration. | |
2009-03-13 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. | |
2009-03-12 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 1; absent, 2; excused, 2. | |
2009-03-12 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-12 | Floor amendment | |
2009-03-12 | 1st substitute bill not substituted. | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-23 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-23 | HSC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-20 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-02-05 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-01-26 | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |