WA SB5518 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-17 - Effective date 7/28/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-17 - Effective date 7/28/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Making nonsubstantive changes to election laws.
Title
Making nonsubstantive changes to election laws.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-17 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2013. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Chapter 11, 2013 Laws PV. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Governor partially vetoed. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2013-04-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-04-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2013-04-03 | House | Placed on third reading. |
2013-04-03 | House | Committee recommendations adopted. |
2013-04-02 | House | Placed on second reading suspension calendar by Rules Committee. |
2013-03-28 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-03-26 | House | GOE - Majority; do pass. |
2013-03-26 | House | GOE - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-03-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 9:00 AM. |
2013-03-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2013-03-14 | House | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | GOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 6:00 PM. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 6:00 PM. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to Governmental Operations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1157 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-13 - Referred to Government Operations & Elections.