WA SB5512 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning independent medical exam and consultation and vocational rehabilitation assessment scheduling authority for qualified retrospective rating plan employers and groups.
Title
Concerning independent medical exam and consultation and vocational rehabilitation assessment scheduling authority for qualified retrospective rating plan employers and groups.
Sponsors
Sen. John Braun [R] | Sen. Michael Baumgartner [R] | Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Barbara Bailey [R] |
Sen. Mark Schoesler [R] | Sen. Judith Warnick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-01-22 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5512&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5512.pdf |