WA SB5508 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing two-year registration periods for certain vehicles while maintaining existing annual vehicle registration fee amounts.
Title
Authorizing two-year registration periods for certain vehicles while maintaining existing annual vehicle registration fee amounts.
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Hawkins [R] | Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. Phil Fortunato [R] | Sen. Steve O'Ban [R] |
Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Placed on Rules White Sheet. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Rules Green Sheet. |
2017-04-23 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-03-22 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2017-03-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2017-03-03 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | On motion, referred to Rules Green Sheet for second reading. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |