WA SB5506 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Effective date 7/28/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning parking at rest areas.
Title
Concerning parking at rest areas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-21 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2019. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Chapter 436, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2019-04-27 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 42; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2019-04-17 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2019-04-17 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee recommendations adopted and the bill amended. |
2019-04-15 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-04-03 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2019-04-03 | House | TR - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2019-04-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-03-13 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 33; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |