WA SB5503 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning payment of delinquent property taxes.
Title
Concerning payment of delinquent property taxes.
Sponsors
Sen. Pamela Roach [R] | Sen. Jerome Delvin [R] | Sen. Stephen Litzow [R] | Sen. Karen Fraser [D] |
Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] | Sen. Paull Shin [D] | Sen. Mike Padden [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Moved to Rules White Sheet. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | GOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | First reading, referred to Governmental Operations. |