WA SB5501 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a public education program to reduce the incidence of stillbirth using a platform for recording and tracking fetal movements.
Title
Establishing a public education program to reduce the incidence of stillbirth using a platform for recording and tracking fetal movements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care: do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; do pass. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 10:30 AM. |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 70 | 619 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 09 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 09 | 800 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |