WA SB5500 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a replacement ballot by telephone, mail, or in person to a voter who is not a voter that is overseas or in the military.
Title
Providing a replacement ballot by telephone, mail, or in person to a voter who is not a voter that is overseas or in the military.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-04-02 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 9:00 AM. |
2013-03-06 | House | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | GOV - Majority; do pass. |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 6:00 PM. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | First reading, referred to Governmental Operations. |