WA SB5500 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning methicillin-resistant staphylococcus aureus.
Title
Concerning methicillin-resistant staphylococcus aureus.
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Evans-Parlette [R] | Sen. Rosa Franklin [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Jeanne Kohl-Welles [D] |
Sen. Edward Murray [D] | Sen. Cheryl Pflug [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-18 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2010-01-11 | Made eligible to be placed on third reading. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-04-26 | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2009-03-11 | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. | |
2009-03-09 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-03-09 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-09 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-17 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-02-06 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-06 | HEA - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-05 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-02-04 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-01-23 | First reading, referred to Health & Long-Term Care. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5500&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5500.pdf |