WA SB5488 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Facilitating integration of behavioral health care and primary care.
Title
Facilitating integration of behavioral health care and primary care.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2011-03-07 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-03-02 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2011-02-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-25 | WM - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-02-24 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Ways & Means. | |
2011-02-16 | And refer to Ways & Means. | |
2011-02-16 | HEA - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-02-16 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 9:00 AM. | |
2011-02-02 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long-Term Care at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-01-27 | First reading, referred to Health & Long-Term Care. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5488&year=2011 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2011-12/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5488.pdf |