WA SB5487 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Effective date 8/1/2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Effective date 8/1/2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a certification program for commercial egg laying chicken operations.
Title
Establishing a certification program for commercial egg laying chicken operations.
Sponsors
Sen. Randi Becker [R] | Sen. Jerome Delvin [R] | Sen. Brian Hatfield [D] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] |
Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] | Sen. Mark Schoesler [R] | Sen. Paull Shin [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-21 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 70 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 70 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Effective date 8/1/2012. | |
2011-05-10 | Chapter 306, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-05-10 | Governor signed. | |
2011-04-22 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2011-04-22 | Speaker signed. | |
2011-04-22 | President signed. | |
2011-04-21 | Passed final passage; yeas, 32; nays, 14; absent, 1; excused, 2. | |
2011-04-21 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2011-04-11 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 70; nays, 27; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2011-04-11 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-11 | Floor amendment | |
2011-04-05 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-03-24 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-03-22 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-03-22 | AGNR - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-03-22 | AGNR - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-03-22 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-03-18 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-03-09 | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources. | |
2011-03-07 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 34; nays, 13; absent, 1; excused, 1. | |
2011-03-07 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-07 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2011-02-28 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2011-02-18 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-18 | ARED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-02-17 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture & Rural Economic Development at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-01-31 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture & Rural Economic Development at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-01-27 | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Rural Economic Development. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1813 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.