WA HB1813 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a certification program for commercial egg laying chicken operations.
Title
Establishing a certification program for commercial egg laying chicken operations.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Blake [D] | Rep. Vincent Buys [R] | Rep. Bruce Chandler [R] | Rep. Kathryn Haigh [D] |
Rep. Chris Reykdal [D] | Rep. James Wilcox [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-02-03 | First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5487 (Crossfiled) 2011-05-10 - Effective date 8/1/2012.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1813&year=2011 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2011-12/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1813.pdf |