WA SB5460 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective date 7/25/2021*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective date 7/25/2021*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Implementing recommendations of the autonomous vehicle work group.
Title
Implementing recommendations of the autonomous vehicle work group.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-11 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 86 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Committee on Transportation: do pass (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Transportation: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Senate | Effective date 7/25/2021*. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Chapter 193, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 86; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-11 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-10 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-04-02 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-03-31 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-03-31 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-03-31 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 2:00 PM. |
2021-03-29 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2021-03-15 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2021-03-10 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 37 | 480 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
46 | 92 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |