WA SB5444 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-14 - Effective date 7/28/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-14 - Effective date 7/28/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating greater efficiency in the offices of county assessor by eliminating the requirement to annually appraise tax-exempt government properties.
Title
Creating greater efficiency in the offices of county assessor by eliminating the requirement to annually appraise tax-exempt government properties.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Sharon Nelson [D] | Sen. Jeanne Kohl-Welles [D] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] |
Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] | Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Daniel Kline [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-15 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-14 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2013. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Chapter 235, 2013 Laws. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2013-04-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-04-15 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 91; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2013-04-15 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-04-12 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-04-08 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-04-08 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2013-04-08 | House | FIN - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-04-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2013-04-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 9:00 AM. |
2013-03-29 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2013-03-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-03-28 | House | LG - Majority; do pass. |
2013-03-28 | House | LG - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-03-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:30 AM. |
2013-03-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM. |
2013-03-14 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | WM - Majority; without recommendation. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | GOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 6:00 PM. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | First reading, referred to Governmental Operations. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1575 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-13 - Referred to Local Government.