WA SB5444 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the construction of a state boundary bridge.
Title
Concerning the construction of a state boundary bridge.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2011-02-10 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-10 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2011-02-10 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-02-09 | TRAN - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-02-08 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2011-01-31 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2011-01-25 | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1383 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5444&year=2011 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2011-12/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5444.pdf |